THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:41:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department Of Radiology
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Carleton Place and
District Memorial Hospital
Department of Radiology
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: (613) 257-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Spring Street
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: 6132562500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.L Cao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cao (CPSO#: 91175 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4

Corporation Name: R.L. Cao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department Of Radiology
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Carleton Place and
District Memorial Hospital
Department of Radiology
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place Ontario K7C 1J4
Phone: (613) 257-2200
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Spring Street
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: 6132562500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.L Cao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cao (CPSO#: 91175 )
Business Address: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4

Corporation Name: R.L. Cao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 May 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUI LILY CAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUI LILY CAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009