THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:38:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 772 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-477-0163
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 175 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1A9
Phone: 613-766-0318
Extension: 700
Fax: 613-766-0339
Address: 772 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
Phone: 613-766-0318
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-105 Sutherland Dr
Kingston ON K7K 5V6
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ziny Yen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Yen (CPSO#: 91179 )
Business Address: CDK Family Medicine
175 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1A9
(613) 766-0318
Business Address: 772 Princess Street
Princess Street Medical Centre
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
343-477-0163

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 772 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-477-0163
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 175 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1A9
Phone: 613-766-0318
Extension: 700
Fax: 613-766-0339
Address: 772 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
Phone: 613-766-0318
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8-105 Sutherland Dr
Kingston ON K7K 5V6
Phone: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ziny Yen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Yen (CPSO#: 91179 )
Business Address: CDK Family Medicine
175 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1A9
(613) 766-0318
Business Address: 772 Princess Street
Princess Street Medical Centre
Kingston Ontario K7L 4V1
343-477-0163

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZINY CHI YEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZINY CHI YEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009