THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:56:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 318
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 289-2166
Fax: (416) 289-2168

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Klinghoffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Klinghoffer (CPSO#: 86213 ) Dr. J. Ostro (CPSO#: 91198 )
Business Address: 318 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 289-2166
Business Address: 402 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 479-7680

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 318
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 289-2166
Fax: (416) 289-2168

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Klinghoffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Klinghoffer (CPSO#: 86213 ) Dr. J. Ostro (CPSO#: 91198 )
Business Address: 318 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 289-2166
Business Address: 402 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 479-7680

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ANNE OSTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ANNE OSTRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSTRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009