THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 Brant St
Suite 201
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2897450051
Fax: (888) 898-5095
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Indra Warren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Warren (CPSO#: 91219 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: 201 - 460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
(289) 745-0051

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 460 Brant St
Suite 201
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2897450051
Fax: (888) 898-5095
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-632-3737
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Indra Warren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Warren (CPSO#: 91219 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: 201 - 460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
(289) 745-0051

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INDRA PRATHISTA WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INDRA PRATHISTA WARREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARREN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009