THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Guyana, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital Campus
Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road Room
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3129
Fax: (519) 663-3328

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anita Florendo-Cumbermack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Florendo-Cumbermack (CPSO#: 91226 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital Campus
Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3129

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Guyana, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital Campus
Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road Room
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3129
Fax: (519) 663-3328

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anita Florendo-Cumbermack Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Florendo-Cumbermack (CPSO#: 91226 )
Business Address: LHSC University Hospital Campus
Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-3129

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA GONSALVEZ FLORENDO-CUMBERMACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORENDO-CUMBERMACK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANITA GONSALVEZ FLORENDO-CUMBERMACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLORENDO-CUMBERMACK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Guyana, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009