THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1740 Montréal Rd
Gloucester ON K1J 6N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-366-2605
Fax: 343-888-2605

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emilie Daigneault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Daigneault (CPSO#: 91250 )
Business Address: Clinique Medicale Asclepios
2 - 750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orléans Ontario K1C 1T1
(613) 830-8388
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3E5
(613) 632-1111
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Address: 1740 Montréal Rd
Gloucester ON K1J 6N3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1740 Montréal Rd
Gloucester ON K1J 6N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-366-2605
Fax: 343-888-2605

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emilie Daigneault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Daigneault (CPSO#: 91250 )
Business Address: Clinique Medicale Asclepios
2 - 750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orléans Ontario K1C 1T1
(613) 830-8388
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3E5
(613) 632-1111
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Address: 1740 Montréal Rd
Gloucester ON K1J 6N3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIE DAIGNEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAIGNEAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILIE DAIGNEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAIGNEAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009