THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:08:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 7
55 Frid St
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055292259
Fax: 9055292262
Address: 17 Park Avenue East
Chatham Ontario N7M 3V3
Phone: 5193527378
Fax: 5193527376
Address: Scarborough Sleep Clinic
2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 302
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Phone: 416-292-3218
Fax: 416-292-3200
Address: Toronto Lung Care Clinic
1110 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M2K2W2
Phone: 4162292315
Fax: 4162239828
Address: Toronto Sleep & Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street, Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-439-5508
Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 416-292-3218
Fax: 416-292-3200

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salman Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 91255 )
Business Address: 1011-123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
(416) 813-2277
Business Address: 7 - 55 Frid Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4M3
(905) 529-2259
Business Address: 118 - 282 Linwell Road
St Catharines Ontario L2N 6N5
(905) 529-2259
Business Address: 204 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 229-2315
Business Address: 302-2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
(416) 292-3218
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Address: 17 Park Avenue East
Chatham Ontario N7M 3V3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 7
55 Frid St
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055292259
Fax: 9055292262
Address: 17 Park Avenue East
Chatham Ontario N7M 3V3
Phone: 5193527378
Fax: 5193527376
Address: Scarborough Sleep Clinic
2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 302
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
Phone: 416-292-3218
Fax: 416-292-3200
Address: Toronto Lung Care Clinic
1110 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 204
Toronto Ontario M2K2W2
Phone: 4162292315
Fax: 4162239828
Address: Toronto Sleep & Pulmonary Centre
123 Edward Street, Suite 1011
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
Phone: 416-813-2277
Fax: 416-439-5508
Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Phone: 416-292-3218
Fax: 416-292-3200

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salman Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 91255 )
Business Address: 1011-123 Edward Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1E2
(416) 813-2277
Business Address: 7 - 55 Frid Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4M3
(905) 529-2259
Business Address: 118 - 282 Linwell Road
St Catharines Ontario L2N 6N5
(905) 529-2259
Business Address: 204 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 229-2315
Business Address: 302-2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1P 3E2
(416) 292-3218
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Address: 17 Park Avenue East
Chatham Ontario N7M 3V3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMAN RAFAT CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALMAN RAFAT CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009