THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:02:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk, Suite 409
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-9300
Fax: 519-804-9301
Address: 250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo Ontario N2J 0E2
Phone: 519 904 0650
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arthur Winter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Winter (CPSO#: 91262 )
Business Address: 16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
(519) 804-9234
Business Address: 409-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
519-804-9300

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk, Suite 409
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-804-9300
Fax: 519-804-9301
Address: 250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo Ontario N2J 0E2
Phone: 519 904 0650
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arthur Winter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Winter (CPSO#: 91262 )
Business Address: 16 Andrew Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 5R2
(519) 804-9234
Business Address: 409-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C1
519-804-9300

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARTHUR JOHN WINTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARTHUR JOHN WINTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009