THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 03:48:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unison Health And
Community Services
1541 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M9N 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-7575
Fax: (416) 645-7570
Address: 9-2624 Dunwin Dr
Mississauga ON L5L 3T5
Phone: 9056080050
Fax: 2898019960
Address: Life Clinic
101 Queensway
Suite 400
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Phone: 9053660053
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aisha James Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. James (CPSO#: 91306 )
Business Address: Unison Health and Community Services
1541 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M9N 2R3
(416) 645-7575
Business Address: Life Clinic
400-101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 366-0053

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unison Health And
Community Services
1541 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M9N 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-7575
Fax: (416) 645-7570
Address: 9-2624 Dunwin Dr
Mississauga ON L5L 3T5
Phone: 9056080050
Fax: 2898019960
Address: Life Clinic
101 Queensway
Suite 400
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Phone: 9053660053
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aisha James Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. James (CPSO#: 91306 )
Business Address: Unison Health and Community Services
1541 Jane Street
Toronto Ontario M9N 2R3
(416) 645-7575
Business Address: Life Clinic
400-101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 366-0053

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISHA NYOTA PIA JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AISHA NYOTA PIA JAMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009