THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Our Lady of Fatima University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416 603 5607
Fax: 416 603 5490
Address: 407 Huron Street
3rd Floor
Hong Fook Mental Health Association
Toronto Ontario M5S 2G5
Phone: 416-493-4242
Fax: 416-595-6332
Address: 1881 Yonge Street Suite 616 M4S 3C4
Phone: 416-559-6376
Fax: 416-572-6060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lin (CPSO#: 91316 )
Business Address: 407 Huron St
Toronto ON M5S 2G5
4164934242
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 9 E W
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5349

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Our Lady of Fatima University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 416 603 5607
Fax: 416 603 5490
Address: 407 Huron Street
3rd Floor
Hong Fook Mental Health Association
Toronto Ontario M5S 2G5
Phone: 416-493-4242
Fax: 416-595-6332
Address: 1881 Yonge Street Suite 616 M4S 3C4
Phone: 416-559-6376
Fax: 416-572-6060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Lin (CPSO#: 91316 )
Business Address: 407 Huron St
Toronto ON M5S 2G5
4164934242
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 9 E W
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5349

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YI-TSERN NANCY LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YI-TSERN NANCY LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Our Lady of Fatima University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009