THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:40:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Belarusian State Medical University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm Street
Elgin Surgical Associates
South Building, A Unit
G 127
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195693229
Fax: 5196336403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zhuruk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zhuruk (CPSO#: 91317 )
Business Address: Elgin Surgical Associates
South Building, A Unit
Room G127
5196373292
Business Address: Surgical Associates Office
236 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 1J5
(519) 631-0567

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Belarusian State Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Elm Street
Elgin Surgical Associates
South Building, A Unit
G 127
St. Thomas Ontario N5R 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195693229
Fax: 5196336403

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zhuruk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zhuruk (CPSO#: 91317 )
Business Address: Elgin Surgical Associates
South Building, A Unit
Room G127
5196373292
Business Address: Surgical Associates Office
236 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 1J5
(519) 631-0567

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDR NIKOLAYEVICH ZHURUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHURUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDR NIKOLAYEVICH ZHURUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHURUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Belarusian State Medical University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009