THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:02:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton civic hospital
2100 bovaird dr E, Brampton
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mirza Muhammad Waqas Baig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Baig (CPSO#: 91318 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
brampton civic hospital
ER
ER
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
905-494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton civic hospital
2100 bovaird dr E, Brampton
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 19 Oct 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mirza Muhammad Waqas Baig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Baig (CPSO#: 91318 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
brampton civic hospital
ER
ER
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
905-494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRZA MUHAMMAD WAQAS BAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRZA MUHAMMAD WAQAS BAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Aug 2016
Summary:
Effective August 1, 2019, Dr. Baig has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Aug 2016
Summary:
Effective August 1, 2019, Dr. Baig has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009