THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:13:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
245 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 336-8961
Fax: (519) 513-0500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randy Bahadur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bahadur (CPSO#: 91320 )
Business Address: 201 - 245 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0A6
(226) 336-8961

Corporation Name: Randy Bahadur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
245 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 336-8961
Fax: (519) 513-0500

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randy Bahadur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jul 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bahadur (CPSO#: 91320 )
Business Address: 201 - 245 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0A6
(226) 336-8961

Corporation Name: Randy Bahadur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDY TAMESHWAR BAHADUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHADUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDY TAMESHWAR BAHADUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHADUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009