THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:12:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Huron St W
South Huron Hosptial
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192352700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: South Huron Hospital
24 Huron St W
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Phone: 5192352700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 64944
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. R. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joseph (CPSO#: 91324 )
Business Address: Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St Joseph Hospital
D0-101
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6081
Business Address: J1004 - 1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London Ontario N5Y 5R6
(519) 452-4230
Business Address: Fowler Kennedy Sports Medical Clinic
Western University
1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3011
Business Address: 24 Huron St W
South Huron Hospital
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
5192352700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 24 Huron St W
South Huron Hosptial
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192352700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: South Huron Hospital
24 Huron St W
Exeter Ontario N0M 1S2
Phone: 5192352700
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 64944
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: Seaforth Community Hospital
LOCATION: Seaforth

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. R. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joseph (CPSO#: 91324 )
Business Address: Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St Joseph Hospital
D0-101
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6081
Business Address: J1004 - 1001 Fanshawe College Boulevard
London Ontario N5Y 5R6
(519) 452-4230
Business Address: Fowler Kennedy Sports Medical Clinic
Western University
1151 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3011
Business Address: 24 Huron St W
South Huron Hospital
Exeter ON N0M 1S2
5192352700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN RANDALL JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN RANDALL JOSEPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 May 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009