THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:09:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6884 14 TH AVE
Markham Ontario L6B 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-554-1517
Fax: 905-554-2760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tahreem Shawar Anwar Masih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Anwar Masih (CPSO#: 91367 )
Business Address: 6884 14th Avenue
Unit 1-D
Markham Ontario L6B 0S3
(905) 554-1517

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6884 14 TH AVE
Markham Ontario L6B 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-554-1517
Fax: 905-554-2760

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tahreem Shawar Anwar Masih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Anwar Masih (CPSO#: 91367 )
Business Address: 6884 14th Avenue
Unit 1-D
Markham Ontario L6B 0S3
(905) 554-1517

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAHREEM SHAWAR ANWAR MASIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANWAR MASIH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TAHREEM SHAWAR ANWAR MASIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANWAR MASIH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 May 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009