THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:47:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 502
3030 Lawrence Ave. East
Scarborough, Ontario
M1P2T7
Scarborough Ontario M1P2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168400330
Fax: 4168400333
Address: 550 Highway 7 E
Atrium Surgical Centre
Unit 317
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Z4
Phone: (905) 918-2155
Fax: (905) 918-2721

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sydney Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong (CPSO#: 91371 )
Business Address: 502 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 840-0330

Corporation Name: Dr. Sydney Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 502
3030 Lawrence Ave. East
Scarborough, Ontario
M1P2T7
Scarborough Ontario M1P2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168400330
Fax: 4168400333
Address: 550 Highway 7 E
Atrium Surgical Centre
Unit 317
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3Z4
Phone: (905) 918-2155
Fax: (905) 918-2721

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sydney Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong (CPSO#: 91371 )
Business Address: 502 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 840-0330

Corporation Name: Dr. Sydney Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYDNEY SEK NING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYDNEY SEK NING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009