THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:58:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Region Sleep Disorders Centre
Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
Address: QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roain Bayat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bayat (CPSO#: 91378 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400
Business Address: York Region Sleep Disorders Centre
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 300
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7843

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: York Region Sleep Disorders Centre
Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614
Address: QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roain Bayat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bayat (CPSO#: 91378 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 969-7400
Business Address: York Region Sleep Disorders Centre
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 300
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 4L6
(905) 773-7843

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROAIN BAYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROAIN BAYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009