THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:16:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Hamilton st
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 846-5345
Fax: (519) 846-8544
Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Brault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brault (CPSO#: 91380 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Hamilton st
Elora Ontario N0B 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 846-5345
Fax: (519) 846-8544
Address: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus Ontario N1M 1W2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Brault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brault (CPSO#: 91380 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BRAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAULT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BRAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAULT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009