THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:16:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. Langer's Family Medicine
9455 Mississauga Rd
Brampton Ontario L6X 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 502 0605
Fax: 905 502 0608
Address: Athletes Care
Heart Lake Town Centre
Unit B
180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton Ontario L6Z 1Y4
Phone: (905) 495-4409
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Genesis Family Walk in Clinic
221 Miller Dr, Unit 8-9
Georgetown Ontario L7G6G4
Phone: 9058736776
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2520 Eglinton Ave W
unit 223
CanStrive Medspa and Wellness Clinic
Mississauga ON L5M 0Y4
Phone: 6479951370
Fax: 9055693557

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mukhtiar S. Aheer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aheer (CPSO#: 91407 )
Business Address: Units 8-9
221 Miller Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 6G4
(905) 873-1001
Business Address: 1A Princess Anne Drive
Suite 200
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4W4
(905) 702-1840
Business Address: 9455 Mississauga Road
Brampton Ontario L6X 0B3
(905) 502-0605
Business Address: Athletes Care
Heart Lake Town Centre
Unit B
180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton Ontario L6Z 1Y4
(905) 495-4409

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. Langer's Family Medicine
9455 Mississauga Rd
Brampton Ontario L6X 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 502 0605
Fax: 905 502 0608
Address: Athletes Care
Heart Lake Town Centre
Unit B
180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton Ontario L6Z 1Y4
Phone: (905) 495-4409
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Genesis Family Walk in Clinic
221 Miller Dr, Unit 8-9
Georgetown Ontario L7G6G4
Phone: 9058736776
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2520 Eglinton Ave W
unit 223
CanStrive Medspa and Wellness Clinic
Mississauga ON L5M 0Y4
Phone: 6479951370
Fax: 9055693557

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mukhtiar S. Aheer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aheer (CPSO#: 91407 )
Business Address: Units 8-9
221 Miller Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 6G4
(905) 873-1001
Business Address: 1A Princess Anne Drive
Suite 200
Georgetown Ontario L7G 4W4
(905) 702-1840
Business Address: 9455 Mississauga Road
Brampton Ontario L6X 0B3
(905) 502-0605
Business Address: Athletes Care
Heart Lake Town Centre
Unit B
180 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton Ontario L6Z 1Y4
(905) 495-4409

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUKHTIAR SINGH AHEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHEER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUKHTIAR SINGH AHEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHEER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009