THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Arlington Park Pl
Apex Heart Centre
Unit 2
Kingston ON K7M 7E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135475458
Fax: 6135476406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.R.B. Cases Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cases (CPSO#: 91408 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: Kingston Heart Clinic
460 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1C2
(613) 544-3242

Corporation Name: Cases Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Arlington Park Pl
Apex Heart Centre
Unit 2
Kingston ON K7M 7E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135475458
Fax: 6135476406

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.R.B. Cases Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cases (CPSO#: 91408 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: Kingston Heart Clinic
460 Princess Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 1C2
(613) 544-3242

Corporation Name: Cases Zhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET ROBIN BILLANO CASES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET ROBIN BILLANO CASES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009