THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:02:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian W. Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ferguson (CPSO#: 91441 )
Business Address: Unit 4 Suite A
65 Donly Drive
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 0C2
(226) 440-3555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand General Hospital Hagersville
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: West Haldimand General Hospital
LOCATION: Hagersville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian W. Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ferguson (CPSO#: 91441 )
Business Address: Unit 4 Suite A
65 Donly Drive
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 0C2
(226) 440-3555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN WILLIAM FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN WILLIAM FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009