THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:40:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH Bell Gateway Building
Mood and Anxiety Services
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 39148
Fax: 416-979-4297
Address: 1929 Bayview Avenue
Suite G30
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Phone: 416-488-6980
Fax: 416-488-3998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Klein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Klein (CPSO#: 91448 )
Business Address: CAMH Bell Gateway Building
Mood and Anxiety Services
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH Bell Gateway Building
Mood and Anxiety Services
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 39148
Fax: 416-979-4297
Address: 1929 Bayview Avenue
Suite G30
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Phone: 416-488-6980
Fax: 416-488-3998

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Klein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Klein (CPSO#: 91448 )
Business Address: CAMH Bell Gateway Building
Mood and Anxiety Services
100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN ANTON KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN ANTON KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009