THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:05:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Chlidrens Hospital
H S C 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75808
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Khan and M. Zubairi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan (CPSO#: 91455 ) Dr. M. Zubairi (CPSO#: 90661 )
Business Address: Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: MCMaster Children's Hospital
HSC 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Chlidrens Hospital
H S C 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75808
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: McMaster Children's Hospital Division of Pediatric Critical Care
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Khan and M. Zubairi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Feb 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan (CPSO#: 91455 ) Dr. M. Zubairi (CPSO#: 90661 )
Business Address: Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington Street North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: MCMaster Children's Hospital
HSC 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009