THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:56:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Burr 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 7995
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 13 Jul 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sunil Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel (CPSO#: 91460 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Burr 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 7995
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 13 Jul 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sunil Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel (CPSO#: 91460 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNIL VIJAY PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUNIL VIJAY PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009