THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:35:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 186 Main Street
West Nipissing Family Health Team
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-753-5775
Fax: 705-753-5788
Address: 622 4e Rue Ouest
CISSSAT Hopital d'Amos
Amos Québec J9T 2S2
Phone: 819-732-3341
Extension: 2210
Fax: 819-732-6421
Address: 58 Semo Rd
Lawrence Commanda Health Centre
Garden Village ON P2B 3K2
Phone: (705) 753-3312
Fax: (705) 753-5087
Address: 180 Avenue Anvik
CISSSAT Hopital de Temiscaming-Kipawa
Témiscaming Québec J0Z 3R0
Phone: 819-627-3385
Fax: 819-627-9497
Address: 22 Rue Notre Dame Nord
Pavillon Sainte-Famille Hopital de Ville-Marie
Ville-Marie Québec J9V 1W8
Phone: 819-629-2420
Extension: 4278
Fax: 819-629-3069

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carole Tessier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tessier (CPSO#: 91478 )
Business Address: 5 Kirkland St E
Kirkland Lake ON P2N 1N9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 186 Main Street
West Nipissing Family Health Team
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 1N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-753-5775
Fax: 705-753-5788
Address: 622 4e Rue Ouest
CISSSAT Hopital d'Amos
Amos Québec J9T 2S2
Phone: 819-732-3341
Extension: 2210
Fax: 819-732-6421
Address: 58 Semo Rd
Lawrence Commanda Health Centre
Garden Village ON P2B 3K2
Phone: (705) 753-3312
Fax: (705) 753-5087
Address: 180 Avenue Anvik
CISSSAT Hopital de Temiscaming-Kipawa
Témiscaming Québec J0Z 3R0
Phone: 819-627-3385
Fax: 819-627-9497
Address: 22 Rue Notre Dame Nord
Pavillon Sainte-Famille Hopital de Ville-Marie
Ville-Marie Québec J9V 1W8
Phone: 819-629-2420
Extension: 4278
Fax: 819-629-3069

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carole Tessier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tessier (CPSO#: 91478 )
Business Address: 5 Kirkland St E
Kirkland Lake ON P2N 1N9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLE ROLANDE MARIE TESSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLE ROLANDE MARIE TESSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009