THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:56:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 85 Norfolk Street
Suite 302
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-822-1871
Fax: 519-822-1990
Address: The Elliott Community
170 Metcalfe Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4Y3
Phone: (519) 822-0491
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Village of Riverside Glen
60 Woodlawn Rd. East
Guelph Ontario N1H 8M8
Phone: 519-822-5272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Murray and Dr. Ellen Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lee (CPSO#: 91482 ) Dr. D. Murray (CPSO#: 91824 )
Business Address: 60 Woodlawn Road East
Guelph Ontario N1H 8M8
(519) 822-5272
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 837-6440
Business Address: 170 Metcalfe Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4Y3
(519) 822-0491
Business Address: Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
(519) 824-1010
Business Address: Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
(519) 822-1871
Business Address: 111 Norfolk St
Unit 10
Guelph ON N1H 4J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 85 Norfolk Street
Suite 302
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-822-1871
Fax: 519-822-1990
Address: The Elliott Community
170 Metcalfe Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4Y3
Phone: (519) 822-0491
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Village of Riverside Glen
60 Woodlawn Rd. East
Guelph Ontario N1H 8M8
Phone: 519-822-5272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Murray and Dr. Ellen Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lee (CPSO#: 91482 ) Dr. D. Murray (CPSO#: 91824 )
Business Address: 60 Woodlawn Road East
Guelph Ontario N1H 8M8
(519) 822-5272
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 837-6440
Business Address: 170 Metcalfe Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4Y3
(519) 822-0491
Business Address: Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 6K9
(519) 824-1010
Business Address: Suite 302
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 4J4
(519) 822-1871
Business Address: 111 Norfolk St
Unit 10
Guelph ON N1H 4J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN FON FAY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN FON FAY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009