THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:38:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Cardiology Associates
125 Bell Farm Rd.
Unit 307
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-735-1111
Fax: 705-735-1888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaskaran Singh Kang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kang (CPSO#: 91483 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Address: 307 - 125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
(705) 735-1111
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Cardiology Associates
125 Bell Farm Rd.
Unit 307
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-735-1111
Fax: 705-735-1888

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaskaran Singh Kang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kang (CPSO#: 91483 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Address: 307 - 125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
(705) 735-1111
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASKARAN SINGH KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASKARAN SINGH KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009