THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
unit 1
London Ontario N6H 4L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 673-3900
Fax: (519) 673-5627
Address: University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West,
Unit #203
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Phone: 5194344727
Fax: 5194344700
Address: CPM - Centres for Pain Management
215 Fanshawe Park Road West,
Unit #203
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Phone: (519) 434-4727
Fax: (519) 434-4700
Address: St Joseph Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Hassani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hassani (CPSO#: 91485 )
Business Address: Unit 203
215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 5A9
(519) 434-4727
Business Address: Victoria Hospital
Adult Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St. Joseph Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: University Hospital
Emergency Department
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 1-1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London Ontario N6H 4L1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
unit 1
London Ontario N6H 4L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 673-3900
Fax: (519) 673-5627
Address: University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West,
Unit #203
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Phone: 5194344727
Fax: 5194344700
Address: CPM - Centres for Pain Management
215 Fanshawe Park Road West,
Unit #203
London Ontario N6G 5A9
Phone: (519) 434-4727
Fax: (519) 434-4700
Address: St Joseph Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Hassani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hassani (CPSO#: 91485 )
Business Address: Unit 203
215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London Ontario N6G 5A9
(519) 434-4727
Business Address: Victoria Hospital
Adult Emergency Department
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: St. Joseph Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100
Business Address: University Hospital
Emergency Department
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 685-8500
Business Address: 1-1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London Ontario N6H 4L1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHZAD HASSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHZAD HASSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HASSANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009