THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 20:53:49 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3498 Shadow Creek Road
Severn Ontario L3V 0V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 514-0165
Fax: (705) 514-0770
Address: 75 Ann St
Bracebridge Ontario P1L2E4
Phone: 7056454404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pitcher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pitcher (CPSO#: 91515 )
Business Address: 3498 Shadow Creek Road
Severn Ontario L3V 6H3
(705) 242-8085

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3498 Shadow Creek Road
Severn Ontario L3V 0V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 514-0165
Fax: (705) 514-0770
Address: 75 Ann St
Bracebridge Ontario P1L2E4
Phone: 7056454404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pitcher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pitcher (CPSO#: 91515 )
Business Address: 3498 Shadow Creek Road
Severn Ontario L3V 6H3
(705) 242-8085

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFF PITCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITCHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFF PITCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITCHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009