THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:08:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-6160 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8T 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 548-708-0059
Fax: 226-674-0626

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raj Goel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goel (CPSO#: 91577 )
Business Address: Erie Shores HealthCare
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Urology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 254-5577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103-6160 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON N8T 1E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 548-708-0059
Fax: 226-674-0626

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raj Goel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Goel (CPSO#: 91577 )
Business Address: Erie Shores HealthCare
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington Ontario N8H 1N9
(519) 326-2373
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Urology
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 254-5577

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJ KUMAR GOEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAJ KUMAR GOEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2009