THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 05:01:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: QHC North Hastings Hospital
1H Manor Lane
P.O. Box 157
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
Phone: (613) 332-2825
Fax: No Information Available
Address: QHC Prince Edward County Mem. Hosp.
403 Main Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-1008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
Phone: (613) 392-2540
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Apurva Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel (CPSO#: 91590 )
Business Address: QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 696-7400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: QHC North Hastings Hospital
1H Manor Lane
P.O. Box 157
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
Phone: (613) 332-2825
Fax: No Information Available
Address: QHC Prince Edward County Mem. Hosp.
403 Main Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-1008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
Phone: (613) 392-2540
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Apurva Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel (CPSO#: 91590 )
Business Address: QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 696-7400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. APURVA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. APURVA PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009