THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Christian Medical College, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Congenital Cardioligy Clinic
27-470 Chrysler Dr
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 545-4080
Fax: (647) 494-8687
Address: Dept of Pediatrics
Southlake Regional Health System
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 647-545-4080
Fax: (647) 494-8687
Address: 7-200 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2N4
Phone: 647-545-4080
Fax: 647-494-8687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 05 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 05 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohit Singla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Singla (CPSO#: 91609 )
Business Address: 27 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
(647) 545-4080
Business Address: Suite 306
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Address: 7-200 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2N4
Business Address: 102-1943 Ironoak Way
Oakville Ontario L6H 3V7

Corporation Name: DR. SINGLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Christian Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Congenital Cardioligy Clinic
27-470 Chrysler Dr
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 545-4080
Fax: (647) 494-8687
Address: Dept of Pediatrics
Southlake Regional Health System
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: 647-545-4080
Fax: (647) 494-8687
Address: 7-200 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2N4
Phone: 647-545-4080
Fax: 647-494-8687

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 05 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 05 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Apr 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 05 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohit Singla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Singla (CPSO#: 91609 )
Business Address: 27 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
(647) 545-4080
Business Address: Suite 306
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
Business Address: 7-200 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2N4
Business Address: 102-1943 Ironoak Way
Oakville Ontario L6H 3V7

Corporation Name: DR. SINGLA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHIT SINGLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHIT SINGLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Christian Medical College, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009