THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4300 Upper Middle Rd
Unit 2
Burlington ON L7M 4P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2894275962
Fax: 2894275972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Carter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carter (CPSO#: 91624 )
Business Address: 482 Burlington Ave
Burlington ON L7S 1R5
Business Address: 4300 Upper Middle Road
Unit 2
Burlington Ontario L7M 4P6
6478899041

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Carter Medicine Professional Incorporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4300 Upper Middle Rd
Unit 2
Burlington ON L7M 4P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2894275962
Fax: 2894275972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Carter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Carter (CPSO#: 91624 )
Business Address: 482 Burlington Ave
Burlington ON L7S 1R5
Business Address: 4300 Upper Middle Road
Unit 2
Burlington Ontario L7M 4P6
6478899041

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Carter Medicine Professional Incorporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL STEPHEN CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL STEPHEN CARTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009