THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Guyana, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
15 Westney Road North
Ajax Ontario L1T 1P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 428-8055
Fax: (905) 428-1501
Address: 4158 Sheppard Ave East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 1T3
Phone: 647 267 2176
Extension: 1
Fax: 647 493 3121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donna Rebecca Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Li (CPSO#: 91626 )
Business Address: Unit 2
15 Westney Road North
Ajax Ontario L1T 1P4
(905) 428-8055
Business Address: 4158 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 1T3
(647) 267-2176
Business Address: 1256 Danforth Road
Scarborough Ontario M1J 1E5
(416) 261-3500
Business Address: 857 Milner Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 5N6
(416) 287-3611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Guyana, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
15 Westney Road North
Ajax Ontario L1T 1P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 428-8055
Fax: (905) 428-1501
Address: 4158 Sheppard Ave East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 1T3
Phone: 647 267 2176
Extension: 1
Fax: 647 493 3121

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donna Rebecca Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Li (CPSO#: 91626 )
Business Address: Unit 2
15 Westney Road North
Ajax Ontario L1T 1P4
(905) 428-8055
Business Address: 4158 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 1T3
(647) 267-2176
Business Address: 1256 Danforth Road
Scarborough Ontario M1J 1E5
(416) 261-3500
Business Address: 857 Milner Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 5N6
(416) 287-3611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA REBECCA LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA REBECCA LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Guyana, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009