THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:04:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Liaquat Medical College, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5547 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 296-4500
Fax: (289) 296-5537
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines ON
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-379-4747
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kaleem Ashraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ashraf (CPSO#: 91630 )
Business Address: Portage Medical Family Health Team
5547 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Y2
(289) 296-4500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Liaquat Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5547 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 296-4500
Fax: (289) 296-5537
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines ON
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-379-4747
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kaleem Ashraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ashraf (CPSO#: 91630 )
Business Address: Portage Medical Family Health Team
5547 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 5Y2
(289) 296-4500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALEEM ASHRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHRAF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALEEM ASHRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHRAF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Liaquat Medical College, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 May 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 May 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009