THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PUSHTO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2B-800 King St W
Kitchener ON N2G 1E8
Phone: 226-895-7246
Fax: 226-895-2273
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa Ontario L1G2B9
Phone: 905 5768711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300D Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Phone: 365-653-7246
Fax: 365-653-72-47

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jan 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamid A Khadim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khadim (CPSO#: 91674 )
Business Address: 800 King Street West
Pain care clinic
Unit B
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1E8
226 895 7246
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PUSHTO
Medical School: Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2B-800 King St W
Kitchener ON N2G 1E8
Phone: 226-895-7246
Fax: 226-895-2273
Address: 1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa Ontario L1G2B9
Phone: 905 5768711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300D Fourth Ave
St. Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Phone: 365-653-7246
Fax: 365-653-72-47

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jan 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamid A Khadim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khadim (CPSO#: 91674 )
Business Address: 800 King Street West
Pain care clinic
Unit B
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1E8
226 895 7246
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: 1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMID AHMADZAI KHADIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHADIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMID AHMADZAI KHADIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHADIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009