THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:31:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-3344
Fax: (416) 745-3205

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Shapero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shapero (CPSO#: 91743 )
Business Address: Suite 300
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 745-1091

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-3344
Fax: (416) 745-3205

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Shapero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shapero (CPSO#: 91743 )
Business Address: Suite 300
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 745-1091

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN SHAPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPERO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN SHAPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPERO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009