THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:13:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 HOSPITAL DRIVE
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057432121
Extension: 3084
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Apr 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khalid Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Malik (CPSO#: 91757 )
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121 Extn: 3084

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 HOSPITAL DRIVE
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057432121
Extension: 3084
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Apr 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khalid Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Malik (CPSO#: 91757 )
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121 Extn: 3084

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 Feb 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 03 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Khalid Saaed Malik may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Khalid Saaed Malik may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Sep 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2009