THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:27:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 900 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2150 Robertson Rd
Nepean Ontario K2H 9S1
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 604-0277
Address: 70 university Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5J2M4
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact the Appletree Medical Group: 900 Albion Road, Etobicoke, ON., M9V 1A5. Telephone: 647-722-2370. Fax: (647) 490-6330
Date Received: 12 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Malisic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Malisic (CPSO#: 91780 )
Business Address: Suite 207
3107 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke Ontario M8X 1E4
(647) 971-8383
Business Address: 900 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1A5
(647) 722-2370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 900 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2150 Robertson Rd
Nepean Ontario K2H 9S1
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 604-0277
Address: 70 university Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5J2M4
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking access to a copy or transfer of their medical record can contact the Appletree Medical Group: 900 Albion Road, Etobicoke, ON., M9V 1A5. Telephone: 647-722-2370. Fax: (647) 490-6330
Date Received: 12 Jul 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Malisic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Malisic (CPSO#: 91780 )
Business Address: Suite 207
3107 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke Ontario M8X 1E4
(647) 971-8383
Business Address: 900 Albion Road
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1A5
(647) 722-2370

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DRAGOLJUB MALISIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALISIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DRAGOLJUB MALISIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALISIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2009