THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:31:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 206
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 735-1490
Fax: (519) 735-1730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amster (CPSO#: 91799 ) Dr. J. Samoila (CPSO#: 82340 )
Business Address: 206 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
(519) 735-1490

Corporation Name: Hasnain, Sekhon and Sayed-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2015

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 206
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 735-1490
Fax: (519) 735-1730

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amster (CPSO#: 91799 ) Dr. J. Samoila (CPSO#: 82340 )
Business Address: 206 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
(519) 735-1490

Corporation Name: Hasnain, Sekhon and Sayed-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2015

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Nov 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 21 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

Dr. Solomon Lawrence Amster may practise medicine independently in Family
Medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

Dr. Solomon Lawrence Amster may practise medicine independently in Family
Medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2009