THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:28:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Off Site Adolescent Clinic
3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: (519) 258-0488
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Site/ MaryvaleLocation
Department of Pyschiatry
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
Phone: 519-258-0484
Fax: 248-258-0488

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Mar 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 23 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HUMERAATHAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Athar (CPSO#: 91841 )
Business Address: 3640 Wells St
Windsor ON N9C 1T9

Corporation Name: Humera Athar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Off Site Adolescent Clinic
3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-0484
Fax: (519) 258-0488
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Site/ MaryvaleLocation
Department of Pyschiatry
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3640 Wells Street
Windsor Ontario N9C 1T9
Phone: 519-258-0484
Fax: 248-258-0488

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Mar 2010
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 23 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HUMERAATHAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Athar (CPSO#: 91841 )
Business Address: 3640 Wells St
Windsor ON N9C 1T9

Corporation Name: Humera Athar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 Feb 2011
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 03 2011
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Humera Athar may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent
psychiatry, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Humera Athar may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent
psychiatry, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2009