THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shivaji University, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1870 Altona Rd
Unit B
Pickering ON L1V 0E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054923100
Fax: 9054923140

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Anuradha Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khanna (CPSO#: 91899 )
Business Address: 1870 Altona Rd
Unit B
Altona Medical Center
Pickering ON L1V 0E4
9054923100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU
Medical School: Shivaji University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1870 Altona Rd
Unit B
Pickering ON L1V 0E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054923100
Fax: 9054923140

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Anuradha Khanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khanna (CPSO#: 91899 )
Business Address: 1870 Altona Rd
Unit B
Altona Medical Center
Pickering ON L1V 0E4
9054923100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANURADHA KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANURADHA KHANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHANNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shivaji University, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2009