THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:39:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KONKANI, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan Barboza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Barboza (CPSO#: 91921 )
Business Address: 7 Forestview Dr
Dundas ON L9H 6M9
Business Address: 278 Willard Ave
Toronto ON M6S 3R2

Corporation Name: MILAN BARBOZA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Feb 2023

Corporation Name: Milan Barboza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KONKANI, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Milan Barboza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Barboza (CPSO#: 91921 )
Business Address: 7 Forestview Dr
Dundas ON L9H 6M9
Business Address: 278 Willard Ave
Toronto ON M6S 3R2

Corporation Name: MILAN BARBOZA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Feb 2023

Corporation Name: Milan Barboza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILAN KUMAR BARBOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBOZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MILAN KUMAR BARBOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBOZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Aug 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2009