THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:31:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Ihsan Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Musa (CPSO#: 91931 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
4168068990

Corporation Name: Dr. Ihsan Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 12 Oct 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Ihsan Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Musa (CPSO#: 91931 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
4168068990

Corporation Name: Dr. Ihsan Musa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IHSAN MOHAMMED MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IHSAN MOHAMMED MUSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2009
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2009