THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:42:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Addis Ababa University, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC, TIGRIGNA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 ALBION ROAD
SIUTE G7
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 749 9400
Fax: 416 749 6880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC, TIGRIGNA
Medical School: Addis Ababa University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 ALBION ROAD
SIUTE G7
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 749 9400
Fax: 416 749 6880

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TADESE FESEHAYE DEBRETSION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEBRETSION is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TADESE FESEHAYE DEBRETSION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEBRETSION is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Addis Ababa University, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2009