THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:37:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ovidius Constanta, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 13 Aug 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carmen Rotaru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rotaru (CPSO#: 91993 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 3546

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: University of Ovidius Constanta, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 13 Aug 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carmen Rotaru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rotaru (CPSO#: 91993 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 3546

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Nov 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 27 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Carmen Rotaru may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Carmen Rotaru may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ovidius Constanta, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2009