THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:53:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Cuyo, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
9-MaRS-9085
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 8193
Fax: 416-340-3719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alba (CPSO#: 92035 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Suite 6EN-246
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 8193

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: National University of Cuyo, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
9-MaRS-9085
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 8193
Fax: 416-340-3719

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Sep 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alba (CPSO#: 92035 )
Business Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Suite 6EN-246
585 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 8193

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Aug 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANA CAROLINA ALBA may practise medicine independently in cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANA CAROLINA ALBA may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Cuyo, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Aug 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2009