THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:34:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Room D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 83735
Fax: (416) 480-4999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian H. Cuthbertson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cuthbertson (CPSO#: 92066 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
D108 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Room D108
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 83735
Fax: (416) 480-4999

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian H. Cuthbertson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cuthbertson (CPSO#: 92066 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
D108 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4999

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Jul 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 05 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Brian Hugh Cuthbertson may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Anaesthesia, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Cuthbertson holds a geographical full-time teaching or research
appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire when Dr.
Cuthbertson no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Brian Hugh Cuthbertson may practise medicine only,

(i) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
Department of Anaesthesia, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
Cuthbertson holds a geographical full-time teaching or research
appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of
his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire when Dr.
Cuthbertson no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Aberdeen School of Medicine, Medical Sciences and Nutrition, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2009