THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:48:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Catolica de Santa Maria, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
ASB Rm 2-003
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8Z7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 10297
Fax: (613) 761-4456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 15 Dec 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vicente Corrales-Medina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Corrales Medina (CPSO#: 92086 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R9
(613) 798-5555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Catolica de Santa Maria, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
ASB Rm 2-003
Ottawa Ontario K1V 8Z7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 10297
Fax: (613) 761-4456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 15 Dec 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vicente Corrales-Medina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Corrales Medina (CPSO#: 92086 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4R9
(613) 798-5555

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vicente Francisco Corrales Medina may practise medicine independently in
infectious diseases.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vicente Francisco Corrales Medina may practise medicine independently in
infectious diseases.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Catolica de Santa Maria, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2009