THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:46:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-1550 Enterprise Road
CIRA Health Solutions
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 599-5991
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 27 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nagib Yahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yahmad (CPSO#: 92145 )
Business Address: 100-1550 Enterprise Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4P4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-1550 Enterprise Road
CIRA Health Solutions
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 599-5991
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 27 May 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nagib Yahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yahmad (CPSO#: 92145 )
Business Address: 100-1550 Enterprise Road
Mississauga Ontario L4W 4P4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAGIB YAHYA RAMADAN YAHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAHMAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAGIB YAHYA RAMADAN YAHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAHMAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2009